EP3360621 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THERMOFORMED AND PRESS-HARDENED STEEL SHEET COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hatscher, Ansgar VW AG Sonnenberg 18 38173 Erkerode / DE | [2018/33] | Application number, filing date | 18152864.7 | 23.01.2018 | [2018/33] | Priority number, date | DE201710202294 | 14.02.2017 Original published format: DE102017202294 | [2018/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3360621 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B21D22/02, C21D8/02 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
C21D8/0205 (EP,CN);
B21D22/022 (EP);
C21D1/18 (CN);
C21D2211/008 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] |
Former [2018/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WARMUMGEFORMTEN UND PRESSGEHÄRTETEN STAHLBLECHBAUTEILS | [2018/33] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THERMOFORMED AND PRESS-HARDENED STEEL SHEET COMPONENT | [2018/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT EN TÔLE D'ACIER MOULÉ À CHAUD ET TREMPÉ À LA PRESSE | [2018/33] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 15.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 15.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/17] | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102005032113 (SCHWARTZ EVA [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0015] , [0027]; claims 1,5,10 *; | [X]DE102006019395 (THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] *; | [A]EP2014777 (NEUE MATERIALIEN BAYREUTH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0006] - [0013] *; | [A]WO2009113938 (GESTAMP HARDTECH AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 2 *; | [XDA]US2016145707 (FEUSER PETER [DE], et al) [XD] 1 * figure 5 * [A] 2-9 |