Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023028647 | ![]() | 26.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | US202016921422 | 06.07.2020 | US201213509507 | 30.07.2012 | US202217747723 | 18.05.2022 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | US201816013617 | 20.06.2018 | US201715595929 | 15.05.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021038514 | ![]() | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | US202016921422 | 06.07.2020 | US201213509507 | 30.07.2012 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | US201816013617 | 20.06.2018 | US201715595929 | 15.05.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019142747 | ![]() | 16.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | US201213509507 | 30.07.2012 | US201916013617 | 01.02.2019 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | US201715595929 | 15.05.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9707176 | ![]() | 18.07.2017 | B2 | US2012283179 | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10028910 | ![]() | 24.07.2018 | B2 | US2017326069 | 16.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | US201013509507 | 11.11.2010 | US201715595929 | 15.05.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101915454B | ![]() | 06.11.2018 | B1 | KR20170100037 | 01.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101772372B | ![]() | 29.08.2017 | B1 | KR20130086253 | 31.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101337322B | ![]() | 06.12.2013 | B1 | KR20120101679 | 14.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5973918B | ![]() | 23.08.2016 | B2 | JP2013510821 | 28.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL219722 | ![]() | 31.07.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2498801 | ![]() | 24.01.2018 | B1 | EP2498801 | 19.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102711804B | ![]() | 16.09.2015 | B | CN102711804 | 03.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2780043 | ![]() | 29.01.2019 | C | CA2780043 | 19.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010317994B | ![]() | 06.03.2014 | B2 | AU2010317994 | 31.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3345593 | ![]() | 06.09.2023 | B1 | EP3345593 | 11.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | EP10776997 | 11.11.2010 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012011403 | 25.05.2021 | B8 | BR112012011403 | 01.12.2020 | B1 | BR112012011403 | 19.04.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1120270T | 10.07.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102010011919 | 22.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2498801T | 07.05.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2667069T | 09.05.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1178423 | 13.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20180653T | 01.06.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | EP10776997 | 11.11.2010 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2498801T | 10.05.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA33735 | 01.11.2012 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012005184 | 08.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ599847 | 27.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12012500888 | 03.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2498801T | 31.08.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | EP10776997 | 11.11.2010 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2573995 | 27.01.2016 | C2 | RU2012123739 | 20.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2498801T | 29.06.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | EP10776997 | 11.11.2010 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TN2012000215 | 12.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA109266 | 10.08.2015 | C2 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201203035 | 27.12.2012 | B | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | WO2010EP67249 | 11.11.2010 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011058082 | ![]() | 19.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR078973 | 14.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2012001233 | 05.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO6541566 | 16.10.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CR20120242 | 01.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DOP2012000132 | 30.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ECSP12011889 | 31.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2965209T | 11.04.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE037735T | 28.09.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY159565 | 13.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NI201200086 | 24.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20121316 | 05.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3345593T | 08.04.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2498801T | 02.05.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3345593T | 27.11.2023 | T | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201500871T | 29.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI468171B | 11.01.2015 | B | TW201127395 | 16.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UY33025 | 30.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009052832 | 13.11.2009 | DE102010011919 | 18.03.2010 | Type | ![]() | EP2498801 |