EP3518017 - METHOD AND OPTICAL FIBRE SYSTEM FOR ILLUMINATION AND DETECTION OF AN OBJECT WITH LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Dresden Helmholtzstrasse 10 01069 Dresden / DE | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CZARSKE, Jürgen Eibenstocker Str. 101 01277 Dresden / DE | 02 /
KUSCHMIERZ, Robert Tannenstraße 18 01099 Dresden / DE | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bamberger Straße 49 01187 Dresden / DE | [2019/31] | Application number, filing date | 18153149.2 | 24.01.2018 | [2019/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3518017 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3518017 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B23/24, A61B1/00, G02B23/26, G02B6/00, A61B1/07, A61B5/00, F21V8/00, G02B6/06 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
G02B23/2469 (EP,US);
G01S7/497 (US);
A61B1/00057 (EP,US);
A61B1/00167 (EP,US);
G01S17/04 (US);
G01S7/4818 (US);
G02B23/26 (EP,US);
G02B6/04 (US);
A61B1/00172 (EP,US);
A61B1/07 (EP,US);
G02B6/0006 (EP,US);
G02B6/0008 (EP,US);
G02B6/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/31] | G02B23/24, A61B1/00, G02B23/26, G02B6/00, A61B1/07, A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] |
Former [2019/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND FASEROPTISCHES SYSTEM ZUR BELEUCHTUNG UND DETEKTION EINES OBJEKTS MIT LICHT | [2019/31] | English: | METHOD AND OPTICAL FIBRE SYSTEM FOR ILLUMINATION AND DETECTION OF AN OBJECT WITH LIGHT | [2019/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME À FIBRE OPTIQUE DESTINÉS À ÉCLAIRER ET À DÉTECTER UN OBJET PAR LA LUMIÈRE | [2019/31] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 05.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2018 | AL | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | TR | 17.06.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | IE | 24.01.2021 | LU | 24.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 24.01.2018 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MK | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
TR | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 24.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 24.01.2018 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MK | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 24.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/41] | HU | 24.01.2018 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 24.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 24.01.2018 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 24.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 24.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 24.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 24.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010004297 (IMP INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]WO2017174596 (CENTRE NAT DE LA RECH SCIENT - CNRS [FR], et al) [A] 1-19 * figure - ** page 15, line 9 - page 16, line 27 *; | [A] - DONGGYU KIM ET AL, "Toward a miniature endomicroscope: pixelation-free and diffraction-limited imaging through a fiber bundle", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, US, vol. 39, no. 7, doi:10.1364/OL.39.001921, ISSN 0146-9592, (20140401), pages 1921 - 1924, (20140324), XP001589259 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.39.001921 | [A] - MOONSEOK KIM ET AL, "Transmission matrix of a scattering medium and its applications in biophotonics", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20150518), vol. 23, no. 10, doi:10.1364/OE.23.012648, ISSN 2161-2072, page 12648, XP055492687 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.23.012648 | [A] - REZA NASIRI MAHALATI ET AL, "Resolution limits for imaging through multi-mode fiber", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20130128), vol. 21, no. 2, doi:10.1364/OE.21.001656, ISSN 2161-2072, page 1656, XP055492717 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.21.001656 | [A] - CONKEY DONALD B ET AL, "Lensless two-photon imaging through a multicore fiber with coherence-gated digital phase conjugation", INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, SPIE, PO BOX 10 BELLINGHAM WA 98227-0010 USA, vol. 21, no. 4, doi:10.1117/1.JBO.21.4.045002, ISSN 1083-3668, (20160430), page 45002, (20160418), XP060071961 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.JBO.21.4.045002 | by applicant | WO2004032386 | DE60223103T | US8585587 | US2015015879 | - CUI, M.; YANG, C., "Implementation of a digital optical phase conjugation system and its application to study the robustness of turbidity suppression by phase conjugation", Optics Express, (20100000), vol. 18, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1364/OE.18.003444, page 3444, XP055026360 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.18.003444 | - GU, R. Y.; MAHALATI, R. N.; KAHN, J. M., "Design of flexible multimode fiber endoscope", Optics Express 23, (20150000), page 26905 |