EP3517034 - DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE VITAL SIGN OF A SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/31] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE HAAN, Gerard c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SERTEYN, Aline Anne Marie c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VAN GASTEL, Mark J.H. c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/31] | Application number, filing date | 18153213.6 | 24.01.2018 | [2019/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3517034 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/1455, A61B5/00, A61B5/024 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
A61B5/02416 (EP);
A61B5/14551 (EP);
A61B5/7207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG MINDESTENS EINES LEBENSZEICHENS EINES SUBJEKTS | [2019/31] | English: | DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE VITAL SIGN OF A SUBJECT | [2019/31] | French: | SYSTÈME, DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER AU MOINS UN SIGNE VITAL D'UNE PERSONNE | [2019/31] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 24.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012195486 (KIRENKO IHOR OLEHOVYCH [NL], et al) [X] 1-8,10-14 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0078] * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0112] *; | [X] - WANG WENJIN ET AL, "Algorithmic Principles of Remote PPG", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, vol. 64, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TBME.2016.2609282, ISSN 0018-9294, (20170701), pages 1479 - 1491, (20170615), XP011653906 [X] 1-8,10-14 * page 1479, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 1479, column r, paragraph 4 - page 1481, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 1481, column r, paragraph 2 - page 1482, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 1483, column l, paragraph l - page 1486, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 1486, column r, paragraph l * * page 1488, column l, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2016.2609282 | [A] - DE HAAN GERARD ET AL, "Robust Pulse Rate From Chrominance-Based rPPG", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, vol. 60, no. 10, doi:10.1109/TBME.2013.2266196, ISSN 0018-9294, (20131001), pages 2878 - 2886, (20130916), XP011526965 [A] 1-14 * page 2878, column r, paragraph l - page 2880, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 2881, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2013.2266196 | [AD] - G. DE HAAN; A. VAN LEEST, "Improved motion robustness of remote-PPG by using the blood volume pulse signature", PHYSIOL. MEAS., (2014), vol. 35, page 1913, XP020269523 [AD] 1-14 * page 1915, paragraph 2 - page 1920, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0967-3334/35/9/1913 | by applicant | US2015366492 | WO2015197383 | US2013271591 | - G. DE HAAN; A. VAN LEEST, "Improved motion robustness of remote-PPG by using the blood volume pulse signature", Physiol. Meas., (20140000), vol. 35, doi:doi:10.1088/0967-3334/35/9/1913, page 1913, XP020269523 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0967-3334/35/9/1913 | - G. DE HAAN; A. VAN LEEST, "Improved motion robustness of remote-PPG by using the blood volume pulse signature", Physiol. Meas, (20140000), vol. 35, doi:doi:10.1088/0967-3334/35/9/1913, page 1913, XP020269523 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0967-3334/35/9/1913 |