EP3517257 - BLADE SET ASSEMBLY AND HAIR CUTTING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/31] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phoon, Kin Fatt c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Veninga, Auke c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Maat, Willem c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Rethmeier, Roel Alexander c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
Sablatschan, Siegfried c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
Schratter, Bernhard c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/31] | Application number, filing date | 18153367.0 | 25.01.2018 | [2019/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3517257 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/38, B26B19/06 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
B26B19/3846 (EP,US);
B26B19/06 (EP,US);
B26B19/3853 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLINGENSATZANORDNUNG UND HAARSCHNEIDEGERÄT | [2019/31] | English: | BLADE SET ASSEMBLY AND HAIR CUTTING APPLIANCE | [2019/31] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE LAMES ET APPAREIL DE COUPE DE CHEVEUX | [2019/31] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4221050 (WALTER HENRY J, et al) [X] 1,4,5,12,13,15 * column 5, lines 41-59; figures 1, 2, 5, 7 *; | [X]US2011265331 (MOSEMAN RUSSELL L [US]) [X] 1-3,7-11* the whole document *; | [Y]US2012233865 (KAMMER CARL GOTTFRIED [US]) [Y] 12-14 * paragraph [0023]; figures 2, 3 *; | [Y]FR2975623 (JMB NATSIKA [FR]) [Y] 12,14 * page 5, lines 4-28; figures 1-12 *; | [XDY]WO2014095101 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [XD] 1,4,5 * page 7, lines 1-5; figures 1, 2 * [Y] 12-14; | [Y]US2014259689 (LAU TUNG YAN [CN]) [Y] 12-15 * paragraph [0028]; figures 1, 2, 5 *; | [XY]US2017190062 (SABLATSCHAN SIEGFRIED [NL]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0069] - [0084]; figures 2, 3, 8-11 * [Y] 12-15 | by applicant | WO2014095101 | WO2017153482 |