EP3357661 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING HOUSINGS OF LIGHTING DEVICES, CORRESPONDING HOUSING OF LIGHTING DEVICES AND LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6 80807 München / DE | For:IT
OSRAM S.P.A. - SOCIETA' RIUNITE OSRAM EDISON CLERICI Viale dell'Innovazione, 3 20126 Milano / IT | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUGGIERI, Giuseppe Via degli Alpini, 34 31057 Cendon di Silea (Treviso) / IT | 02 /
REISS, Martin Am Hohen Ranken, 14 93161 Sinzing / DE | 03 /
BISCARO, Alessandro Via Talponera, 72 31050 Ponzano Veneto (Treviso) / IT | 04 /
PEZZATO, Luigi Via Vicinale delle Corti, 8 31000 Treviso / IT | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 18153393.6 | 25.01.2018 | [2018/32] | Priority number, date | IT20170012515 | 06.02.2017 Original published format: IT201700012515 | [2018/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357661 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B29C41/46, B29C41/32, B29C41/38, F21V15/01, B29C41/28 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
F21V15/01 (EP);
B29C39/142 (EP);
B29C41/28 (EP);
B29C41/32 (EP);
B29C41/46 (EP);
B29C2035/0827 (EP);
B29C33/36 (EP);
B29C33/40 (EP);
B29C35/10 (EP);
B29C39/006 (EP);
B29C39/24 (EP);
B29C39/38 (EP);
B29C41/36 (EP);
B29C41/44 (EP);
B29K2083/005 (EP);
B29K2995/0026 (EP);
B29K2995/003 (EP);
B29L2011/00 (EP);
B29L2031/747 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON GEHÄUSEN VON BELEUCHTUNGSEINRICHTUNGEN, ENTSPRECHENDES GEHÄUSE VON BELEUCHTUNGSEINRICHTUNGEN UND BELEUCHTUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2018/32] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING HOUSINGS OF LIGHTING DEVICES, CORRESPONDING HOUSING OF LIGHTING DEVICES AND LIGHTING DEVICE | [2018/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR FABRIQUER DES BOÎTIERS DE DISPOSITIFS D'ÉCLAIRAGE, BOÎTIER CORRESPONDANT DE DISPOSITIFS D'ÉCLAIRAGE ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/28] | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1135649 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1,9,12 * Fig.1 reference numbers 10,35,6 * [Y] 2-8,10,11,13; | [Y]US2002000290 (CRUMP LARRY SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 2-8,10,11,13 * realtive movement. Fig.1 Belt * |