EP3517678 - BEARING DEVICE FOR A TUB IN A LAUNDRY PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states V-Zug AG Industriestrasse 66 6300 Zug / CH | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meienberg, Hilmar Leihgasse 54 6340 Baar / CH | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Sutter, Kurt E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [2019/31] | Application number, filing date | 18153900.8 | 29.01.2018 | [2019/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3517678 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/20, D06F37/26 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
D06F37/20 (EP,US);
D06F34/16 (EP,US);
D06F33/48 (EP,US);
D06F37/265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAGERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN LAUGENBEHÄLTER IN EINER WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/31] | English: | BEARING DEVICE FOR A TUB IN A LAUNDRY PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2019/31] | French: | PALIER POUR LA CUVE DANS UNE MACHINE À TRAITER DU LINGE | [2019/31] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2510836 (RUSSELL WILLIAM J, et al) [Y] 7-9 * figure 1 *; | [XYI]DE4439153 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [X] 1-7,13,14 * the whole document * [Y] 12 [I] 8-11; | [Y]EP0787847 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 12 * figure 3 *; | [XAYI]DE10158597 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0044]; figure 1 * [A] 4-6,8,9,11,13,14 [Y] 7,12 [I] 2; | [A]DE10334572 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] *; | [X]JP2009039319 (PANASONIC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XYI]EP2202344 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,14 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0107]; figures 1-9 * [Y] 7-9,12 [I] 3,4,11,13; | [Y]DE102010013386 (EMZ HANAUER GMBH & CO KGAA [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] *; | [XYI]EP2465994 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6,10 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,7,12 [I] 5,7-9,11,13,14; | [A]EP2529047 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-14* figure 1 * |