30.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
15.03.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
15.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
01.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
07.04.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] |
28.03.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.03.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.03.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.11.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.10.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
14.10.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
28.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.02.2020 |
First examination report |
|
12.02.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] |
10.04.2019 |
Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.02.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.02.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
15.02.2019 |
Change - designated states |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
09.02.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.07.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
30.01.2018 |
Change - representative |
|