EP3396566 - METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOGAMI, Kenji c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
HATA, Sahoko c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 18154377.8 | 31.01.2018 | [2018/44] | Priority number, date | JP20170090562 | 28.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017090562 | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3396566 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06V20/20 (US);
G06F16/248 (EP,US);
G06F16/434 (EP,US);
G06F16/583 (EP,US);
G06F16/5846 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0645 (EP,US);
G06V20/30 (US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06V2201/08 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND PROGRAMM | [2018/44] | English: | METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS AND PROGRAM | [2018/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2018/44] | Examination procedure | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2420941 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0012] , [0 33] , [0035] , [0 59] , [0060] * [I] 2-15; | [I]WO2014186840 (FMP GROUP AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 31 - page 3, line 4 * * page 9, line 30 - page 12, line 29; figure 3 *; | [A]US2016140424 (WANG XIAOYU [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0011] - [0014]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2016217158 (WATANABE YUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0102] - [0113] * | by applicant | JP2003076694 | JP2007317034 |