Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3389346 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3389346



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 459
15.02.2021 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.06.2020 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.04.2020 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
05.03.2020 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.02.2020 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.02.2020 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
24.02.2020 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
24.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.10.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.10.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.10.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.10.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 58
25.10.2019 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 58
08.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
08.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
08.07.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
08.07.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
08.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
08.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.03.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.03.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
05.03.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 10
05.03.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
05.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
30.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
30.01.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
30.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.10.2018 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.10.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.09.2018 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.09.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.09.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 3
17.09.2018 European search report Search / examination 3
17.09.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
24.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.07.2018 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 2
20.06.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 Invitation to indicate the claims to be searched Search / examination 2
26.03.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
26.03.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
26.03.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
26.03.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
26.03.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
26.03.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
26.03.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
26.03.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
26.03.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
26.03.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
26.03.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
26.03.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
31.01.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.01.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
31.01.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
31.01.2018 Description Search / examination 31
31.01.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 3
31.01.2018 Drawings Search / examination 29
31.01.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
26.11.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 80
26.11.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 80