EP3358127 - SUBSEA SYSTEM AND METHODOLOGY UTILIZING PRODUCTION RECEPTACLE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OneSubsea IP UK Limited 100 New Bridge Street London EC4V 6JA / GB | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNE, David 14622 Carols Way Dr. Houston, Texas / US | [2021/49] |
Former [2018/32] | 01 /
DAVID, June 14622 Carols Way Dr. Houston, Texas / US | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 18154656.5 | 01.02.2018 | [2018/32] | Priority number, date | US201762454111P | 03.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762454111 P | US201815882005 | 29.01.2018 Original published format: US201815882005 | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3358127 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3358127 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3358127 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/03, E21B43/12, E21B33/035, E21B33/038 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
E21B33/035 (EP,US);
E21B33/03 (EP,US);
E21B33/0353 (EP);
E21B33/0387 (EP);
E21B33/0407 (US);
E21B33/043 (US);
E21B34/04 (EP,US);
E21B43/01 (US);
E21B43/128 (EP,US);
E21B33/064 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/32] | E21B33/035, E21B33/038 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] |
Former [2018/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UNTERWASSERSYSTEM UND METHODOLOGIE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER HERSTELLUNGSBEHÄLTERSTRUKTUR | [2018/32] | English: | SUBSEA SYSTEM AND METHODOLOGY UTILIZING PRODUCTION RECEPTACLE STRUCTURE | [2018/32] | French: | SYSTÈME SOUS-MARIN ET MÉTHODOLOGIE UTILISANT UNE STRUCTURE DE RÉCEPTACLE DE PRODUCTION | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 03.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2018 | AL | 24.06.2020 | AT | 24.06.2020 | CY | 24.06.2020 | CZ | 24.06.2020 | DK | 24.06.2020 | EE | 24.06.2020 | ES | 24.06.2020 | FI | 24.06.2020 | HR | 24.06.2020 | IT | 24.06.2020 | LT | 24.06.2020 | LV | 24.06.2020 | MC | 24.06.2020 | MK | 24.06.2020 | MT | 24.06.2020 | NL | 24.06.2020 | PL | 24.06.2020 | RO | 24.06.2020 | RS | 24.06.2020 | SE | 24.06.2020 | SI | 24.06.2020 | SK | 24.06.2020 | SM | 24.06.2020 | TR | 24.06.2020 | BG | 24.09.2020 | GR | 25.09.2020 | IS | 24.10.2020 | PT | 26.10.2020 | IE | 01.02.2021 | LU | 01.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | FR | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 01.02.2018 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MK | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
TR | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 01.02.2018 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MK | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 01.02.2018 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 24.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2007246220 (FENTON STEVE P [GB]) [X] 1,4,5,10,11 * paragraphs [0017] , [0020] , [0022]; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,7-9,12,13 [I] 6; | [Y]US2014048277 (JUNE DAVID R [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,7,8,13 * paragraphs [0016] - [0020] - [0022] , [0032] - [0034]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2015354308 (JUNE DAVID R [US], et al) [Y] 2,7-9,12,13* paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0027] , [0032] , [0033]; figures 1,3 * |