|
06.04.2020 |
Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.2019 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.09.2018 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Amendments not yet acceptable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Invitation to indicate the subject-matter to be searched |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2018 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2018 |
Invitation to file claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
77 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
171 |