EP3520911 - COLLECTION BIN FOR AN IN-LINE PRODUCT INSPECTION SYSTEM, AND IN-LINE PRODUCT INSPECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo Safeline Limited Montfort Street Salford Manchester M50 2XD / GB | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANIA, Michal 17441 Cricket Chirp Loop Land O' Lakes, FL 34638 / US | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Mettler-Toledo IP Department Im Langacher 44 8606 Greifensee / CH | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 18154718.3 | 01.02.2018 | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3520911 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3520911 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/36 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
B07C5/36 (EP,BR,US);
B07C5/38 (CN,US);
B07C5/16 (BR,CN,US);
B07C5/34 (US);
B07C5/362 (US);
B65G47/46 (CN);
G01F23/292 (US);
G01N1/02 (BR);
B07C5/00 (BR);
B65G2201/0258 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2019/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SAMMELBEHÄLTER FÜR EIN INLINE-PRODUKTINSPEKTIONSSYSTEM UND INLINE-PRODUKTINSPEKTIONSSYSTEM | [2019/32] | English: | COLLECTION BIN FOR AN IN-LINE PRODUCT INSPECTION SYSTEM, AND IN-LINE PRODUCT INSPECTION SYSTEM | [2019/32] | French: | BAC DE COLLECTE POUR UN SYSTÈME D'INSPECTION DES PRODUITS EN LIGNE ET SYSTÈME D'INSPECTION DES PRODUITS EN LIGNE | [2021/13] |
Former [2019/32] | BAC DE COLLECTE POUR UN SYSTÈME D'INSPECTION DE PRODUIT EN LIGNE ET SYSTÈME D'INSPECTION DE PRODUIT EN LIGNE | Examination procedure | 09.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 09.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2018 | AL | 07.07.2021 | AT | 07.07.2021 | CY | 07.07.2021 | DK | 07.07.2021 | EE | 07.07.2021 | ES | 07.07.2021 | FI | 07.07.2021 | HR | 07.07.2021 | LT | 07.07.2021 | LV | 07.07.2021 | MC | 07.07.2021 | MK | 07.07.2021 | PL | 07.07.2021 | RO | 07.07.2021 | RS | 07.07.2021 | SE | 07.07.2021 | SI | 07.07.2021 | SK | 07.07.2021 | SM | 07.07.2021 | BG | 07.10.2021 | NO | 07.10.2021 | GR | 08.10.2021 | IS | 07.11.2021 | PT | 08.11.2021 | IE | 01.02.2022 | LU | 01.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | FR | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
MK | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2792555 (SARL HARDOUIN JOEL [FR]) [A] 1-12 * figure - *; | [A]US2004069692 (WOOLDRIDGE DONALD R [US]) [A] 1-12* figure - *; | [A]EP1798180 (METTLER TOLEDO GARVENS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figure 2 * | by applicant | US3750881 | US2005133729 | DE10357982 | WO2011068478 |