|
03.04.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
19.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.06.2021 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.06.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.06.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
10.06.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.05.2018 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |