Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.02.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.02.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.05.2021 | Change - applicant | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
16.04.2021 | Change - applicant | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
25.02.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.02.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.04.2019 | Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
18.01.2019 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
18.01.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
18.01.2019 | Change - designated states | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
17.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant | |
17.12.2018 | Change - representative | |
23.11.2018 | Change - inventor | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
02.11.2018 | Change - applicant | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
06.07.2018 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
05.02.2018 | Change - representative |