Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7090853B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2022 | B2 | JP2018128244 | 16.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017020404 | 07.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102471361B | Global Dossier | 28.11.2022 | B1 | KR20180091742 | 16.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017020404 | 07.02.2017 | JP2018012403 | 29.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108458338B | Global Dossier | 25.06.2021 | B | CN108458338 | 28.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017020404 | 07.02.2017 | JP2018012403 | 29.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3358254 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017020404 | 07.02.2017 | JP2018012403 | 29.01.2018 |