EP3358254 - LIQUID FUEL BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYKEG S.r.l. Via Leonardo da Vinci 5/9 24064 Grumello del Monte (BG) / IT | For all designated states TOYOTOMI CO., LTD. 5-17, Momozono-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | [2021/23] |
Former [2021/20] | For all designated states POLYKEG S.r.l. Via Pietro Nenni, 51 24050 Calcinate (BG) / IT | ||
For all designated states TOYOTOMI CO., LTD. 5-17, Momozono-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | |||
Former [2018/49] | For all designated states TOYOTOMI CO., LTD. 5-17, Momozono-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | ||
For all designated states Pet Engineering & Services SRL Via Pietro Nenni, 51 24050 Calcinate (BG) / IT | |||
Former [2018/32] | For all designated states TOYOTOMI CO., LTD. 5-17, Momozono-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIKAWA, Yoshihito c/o Toyotomi Co., Ltd. 5-17, Momozono-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
WALTON, Philip 65 Dene Hall Drive Bishop Auckland County Durham DL14 6UF / GB | [2018/52] |
Former [2018/32] | 01 /
FUJIKAWA, Yoshihito c/o Toyotomi Co., Ltd. 5-17, Momozono-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | Addiss, John William, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 18155112.8 | 05.02.2018 | [2018/32] | Priority number, date | JP20170020404 | 07.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017020404 | JP20180012403 | 29.01.2018 Original published format: JP 2018012403 | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358254 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F23K5/02, F23K5/14, F23D3/02, F24C5/18 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
F24C5/18 (EP);
F23D3/02 (EP);
F23K5/02 (EP);
F23K5/147 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGBRENNSTOFF-BRENNER | [2018/32] | English: | LIQUID FUEL BURNER | [2018/32] | French: | BRÛLEUR À COMBUSTIBLE LIQUIDE | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 03.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5549470 (HENDERSON RICHARD W [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5662468 (HENDERSON RICHARD W [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 20 - line 22; figure 1 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 46 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 13 * * column 6, line 29 - line 38 * * column 6, line 52 - line 62 *; | [A]JPH09229347 (HAYANO FUJIYA) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0012] * * paragraphs [0015] , [0021] * |