13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
12.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
14.05.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
07.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
26.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
05.06.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
10.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.04.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
29.11.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.11.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
01.11.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
30.08.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
01.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2019 |
Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
16.02.2019 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
09.02.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.02.2019 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
08.02.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
18.01.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
18.01.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
18.01.2019 |
Change - designated states |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
08.06.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.02.2018 |
Change - representative |
|