EP3522188 - CAPACITOR STRUCTURE AND POWER MODULE WITH A HIGH PERFORMANCE ELECTRONICS COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Change - refusal | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 18155370.2 | 06.02.2018 | [2019/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522188 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01G4/38, H01G4/40, H01G2/10 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
H01G2/106 (EP,US);
H01G2/065 (EP,US);
H01G2/08 (EP,US);
H01G2/22 (EP,US);
H01G4/30 (US);
H01G4/38 (EP,US);
H01G4/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONDENSATORAUFBAU UND LEISTUNGSMODUL MIT EINEM LEISTUNGSELEKTRONISCHEN BAUELEMENT | [2019/32] | English: | CAPACITOR STRUCTURE AND POWER MODULE WITH A HIGH PERFORMANCE ELECTRONICS COMPONENT | [2019/32] | French: | ENSEMBLE CONDENSATEUR ET MODULE DE PUISSANCE POURVU D'UN COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE DE PUISSANCE | [2019/32] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2020/04] | 05.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2020/12] | 15.09.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 16.09.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016058741 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-14* page 6, line 15 - page 8, line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US2016174356 (SINGH BRIJ N [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] - [0021] , [0025] , [0027] , [0028] , [0030] , [0033] - [0036] - [0059]; figures 1-4,9-10 * [I] 6-14; | [A]US2017169955 (MILLER GALEN W [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0049]; figures 14,15 * * paragraph [0053]; figure 19 * |