EP3360624 - AXISYMMETIC SINGLE CRYSTAL SHOT TUBE FOR HIGH TEMPERATURE DIE CASTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2018/33] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCIN, John Joseph 50 Virginia Rail Drive Marlborough, CT Connecticut 06447 / US | 02 /
SHAH, Dilip M. 95 Hampshire Drive Glastonbury, CT Connecticut 06033 / US | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18155388.4 | 06.02.2018 | [2018/33] | Priority number, date | US201715427897 | 08.02.2017 Original published format: US201715427897 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3360624 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B22D17/20 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
B22D17/2023 (EP,US);
B22D17/10 (EP,US);
B22D17/203 (EP,US);
H01J37/305 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] |
Former [2018/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AXIALSYMMETRISCHES EINKRISTALL-SCHUSSROHR FÜR HOCHTEMPERATURDRUCKGUSS | [2018/33] | English: | AXISYMMETIC SINGLE CRYSTAL SHOT TUBE FOR HIGH TEMPERATURE DIE CASTING | [2018/33] | French: | TUBE D'INJECTION À CRISTAL UNIQUE ASYMÉTRIQUE POUR COULÉE SOUS PRESSION À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE | [2018/33] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 13.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/04] | 21.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0037201 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]EP2450126 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2450131 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]EP3287212 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [E] 1-15 * the whole document * |