EP3370215 - DEVICE FOR GENERATING ONE OR MORE LIGHT SIGNALS WHICH CAN BE IDENTIFIED BY MECHANICAL DETECTION SYSTEMS, AND METHOD FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF ONE OR MORE LIGHT SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2018/44] |
Former [2018/36] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Birkner, Leonhard Augustenstr. 75 80333 München / DE | 02 /
Hobohm, Daniel Baaderstraße 47 80469 München / DE | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 18155791.9 | 08.02.2018 | [2018/36] | Priority number, date | DE201710203300 | 01.03.2017 Original published format: DE102017203300 | [2018/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3370215 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/095, G06K9/00 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
G08G1/095 (EP);
G06V20/584 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN VON EINEM ODER MEHREREN DURCH MASCHINELLE ERKENNUNGSSYSTEME IDENTIFIZIERBAREN LICHTSIGNALEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION VON EINEM ODER MEHREREN LICHTSIGNALEN | [2018/36] | English: | DEVICE FOR GENERATING ONE OR MORE LIGHT SIGNALS WHICH CAN BE IDENTIFIED BY MECHANICAL DETECTION SYSTEMS, AND METHOD FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF ONE OR MORE LIGHT SIGNALS | [2018/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'UN OU DE PLUSIEURS SIGNAUX LUMINEUX IDENTIFIABLES PAR DES SYSTÈMES DE DÉTECTION AUTOMATIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN OU DE PLUSIEURS SIGNAUX LUMINEUX | [2018/36] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/33] | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2014051417 (TELEKOM MALAYSIA BERHAD [MY]) [X] 1,2 * page 6, lines 3-5 * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 2 * * page 7, lines 10-16; figures 1-4,14-16,18 * [Y] 11-13 [I] 3-10; | [Y]JPH02287798 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [Y] 11-13 * the whole document * |