|
23.04.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2024 |
Communication regarding the forthcoming grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.09.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
14.09.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
30.08.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2023 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2023 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2023 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2023 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.02.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2021 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.07.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2021 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.07.2018 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |