EP3366436 - METHOD OF PRODUCING OUTER BLADE FOR HAIR CUTTING DEVICE, OUTER BLADE FOR HAIR CUTTING DEVICE AND HAIR CUTTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OMORI, Masato c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
HIGUCHI, Katsuhiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
NAOE, Hiroyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
YAMADA, Koji c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
SHIMIZU, Hiroaki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
OKURA, Shoki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 18156129.1 | 09.02.2018 | [2018/35] | Priority number, date | JP20170034144 | 24.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017034144 | [2018/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3366436 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3366436 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/04, B26B19/38, B26B19/42 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
B26B19/3893 (EP,US);
A45D26/00 (CN);
B26B19/042 (EP);
B26B19/044 (CN);
B26B19/143 (US);
B26B19/384 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/35] | B26B19/14, B26B19/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] |
Former [2018/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER AUSSENKLINGE FÜR EINE HAARSCHNEIDEVORRICHTUNG, AUSSENKLINGE FÜR EINE HAARSCHNEIDEVORRICHTUNG UND HAARSCHNEIDEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/35] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING OUTER BLADE FOR HAIR CUTTING DEVICE, OUTER BLADE FOR HAIR CUTTING DEVICE AND HAIR CUTTING DEVICE | [2018/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE LAME EXTERNE POUR DISPOSITIF DE COUPE DE CHEVEUX, LAME EXTERNE POUR DISPOSITIF DE COUPE DE CHEVEUX ET DISPOSITIF DE COUPE DE CHEVEUX | [2018/35] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 14.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | IT | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2266885 (MARTIN WENDELL L) [X] 8,10 * page 1, column right, line 57 - page 2, column left, paragraph 13 * [A] 1-7,9; | [XA]US4138811 (CHAUVY JEAN-DANIEL) [X] 8,10 * column 2, line 6 - line 16 * [A] 1-7,9; | [A]EP1607196 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [XPA]EP3257640 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 8-10 * paragraph [0223] * [A] 1-7 | Examination | JPS5161354 | by applicant | JP2011200492 |