EP3524144 - CONTROLLING A WEARABLE CUFF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AELEN, Paul c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KUENEN, Maarten Petrus Joseph c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/33] | Application number, filing date | 18156346.1 | 12.02.2018 | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3524144 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/021, A61B5/022 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
A61B5/02141 (EP,US);
A61B5/022 (EP);
A61B5/02225 (US);
A61B5/0225 (US);
A61B5/024 (US);
A61B5/0235 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG EINER WEARABLE-MANSCHETTE | [2019/33] | English: | CONTROLLING A WEARABLE CUFF | [2019/33] | French: | COMMANDE D'UN BRASSARD VESTIMENTAIRE | [2019/33] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2012220884 (YAMASHITA SHINGO [JP], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * paragraph [0010] * [A] 9,10 [I] 2-8,11-13; | [XAI]US2014257116 (KOBAYASHI TATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,11,13-15 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0074] * [A] 9,10 [I] 6,12; | [XAI]WO2017129495 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,14,15 * page 7, line 6 - line 12 * [A] 9,10[I] 2-8,11-13; | [XAI]US2017245769 (NIEHAUS LOGAN [US], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0141] * [A] 9,10 [I] 2-8,11-13 | by applicant | US9017264 |