EP3348282 - MMP ACTIVATED VASCULAR DISRUPTING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ellipses Pharma Limited Berkeley Square House Berkeley Square London W1J 6BD / GB | [2019/22] |
Former [2018/29] | For all designated states Incanthera Limited 76 King Street Manchester M2 4NH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILL, Jason C/o Newcastle University School of Pharmacy King George VI Building & Northern Institute for Cancer Research (NICR) Newcastle NE1 7RU / GB | 02 /
LOADMAN, Paul University of Bradford Bradford, Yorkshire BD7 1DP / GB | 03 /
FALCONER, Robert University of Bradford Bradford, Yorkshire BD7 1DP / GB | 04 /
PATTERSON, Laurence University of Bradford Bradford, Yorkshire BD7 1DP / GB | 05 /
ATKINSON, Jennifer 36a Church Street Needingworth, Cambridgeshire PE27 4TB / GB | 06 /
BIBBY, Michael Can Aderyn Cwm Cou Newcastle Emlyn SA38 9PE Wales / GB | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/29] | 01 /
GILL, Jason University of Bradford Bradford, Yorkshire BD7 1DP / GB | ||
02 /
LOADMAN, Paul University of Bradford Bradford, Yorkshire BD7 1DP / GB | |||
03 /
FALCONER, Robert University of Bradford Bradford, Yorkshire BD7 1DP / GB | |||
04 /
PATTERSON, Laurence University of Bradford Bradford, Yorkshire BD7 1DP / GB | |||
05 /
ATKINSON, Jennifer 36a Church Street Needingworth, Cambridgeshire PE27 4TB / GB | |||
06 /
BIBBY, Michael Can Aderyn Cwm Cou Newcastle Emlyn SA38 9PE Wales / GB | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 18156526.8 | 27.03.2008 | [2018/29] | Priority number, date | GB20070007034 | 12.04.2007 Original published format: GB 0707034 | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3348282 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/65, A61P35/00, A61P29/02, A61P9/08 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/64 (US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K47/55 (US);
A61K47/60 (US);
A61K47/65 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/09] |
Former [2018/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MMP-AKTIVIERTE GEFÄSSZERSTÖRENDE WIRKSTOFFE | [2018/29] | English: | MMP ACTIVATED VASCULAR DISRUPTING AGENTS | [2018/29] | French: | AGENTS PERTURBATEURS VASCULAIRES ACTIVÉS MMP | [2018/29] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 17.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/18] | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08718877.7 / EP2134372 | EP12160565.3 / EP2481429 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 18.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 18.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ALBRIGHT C F ET AL, "Matrix-metallloproteinase-activated doxorubicin prodrugs inhibit HT1080 xenograft growth better than doxorubicin with less toxicity", MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20050501), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 1535-7163, pages 751 - 760, XP002456667 [A] 1-23 * figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-05-0006 |