EP3338765 - STEROID DERIVATIVE FOR THE DELIVERY OF MRNA IN HUMAN GENETIC DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Translate Bio, Inc. 29 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUILD, Braydon, Charles 109 Riverdale Road Concord, MA Massachusetts 01742 / US | 02 /
DEROSA, Frank 26 Mount Auburn Street Chelmsford, MA Massachusetts 01824 / US | 03 /
HEARTLEIN, Michael 167 Reed Farm Road Boxborough, MA Massachusetts 01719 / US | 04 /
CONCINO, Michael 297 Long Hill Road Bolton, MA Massachusetts 01740 / US | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 18156531.8 | 30.11.2010 | [2018/26] | Priority number, date | US20090265653P | 01.12.2009 Original published format: US 265653 P | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3338765 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3338765 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61K48/00, A61K31/7105, C07H21/02 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61K48/0033 (US);
A61K48/0008 (US);
A61K48/005 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP);
A61K9/1271 (EP,US);
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
A61K9/5123 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] |
Former [2018/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 24.05.2018 | ME | 24.05.2018 | Title | German: | STEROIDDERIVAT ZUR AUSGABE VON MRNA BEI HUMANGENETISCHEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2018/26] | English: | STEROID DERIVATIVE FOR THE DELIVERY OF MRNA IN HUMAN GENETIC DISEASES | [2018/26] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE STÉROÏDÉE SUITABLE POUR L'ADMINISTRATION D'ARNM DANS DES MALADIES GÉNÉTIQUES HUMAINES | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 27.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 07.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10835016.6 / EP2506857 | Divisional application(s) | EP18167995.2 / EP3403647 | EP22181362.9 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9011092 (VICAL INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US4737323 | US4897355 | US4920016 | US4946683 | US5171678 | US5194654 | US5223263 | US5334761 | US5677124 | US5744335 | US5885613 | WO2005121348 | US19970835281 | US19980083294 |