EP3528047 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING A PARAMETER OF INTEREST USING IMAGE PLANE DETECTION TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANDEY, Nitesh P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 02 /
ZHOU, Zili P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 03 /
VAN DER ZOUW, Gerbrand P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 04 /
DEN BOEF, Arie, Jeffrey P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 05 /
VAN KRAAIJ, Markus, Gerardus, Martinus, Maria P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 06 /
KOOLEN, Armand, Eugene, Albert P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 07 /
CRAMER, Hugo, Augustinus Joseph P.O. BOx 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 08 /
HINNEN, Paul, Christiaan P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 09 /
VAN WEERT, Martinus, Hubertus, Maria P.O. Box 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 10 /
TSIATMAS, Anagnostis P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 11 /
WANG, Shu-jin P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 12 /
FAGGINGER AUER, Bastiaan, Onne P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 13 /
VERMA, Alok P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Broeken, Petrus Henricus Johannes ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property De Run 6501 P.O.Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | Broeken, Petrus Henricus Johannes ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O.Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 18156625.8 | 14.02.2018 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3528047 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
G03F7/70616 (EP,IL,US);
G03F7/70625 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01N21/21 (IL,KR,US);
G01N21/8806 (IL,KR,US);
G03F7/70191 (IL,KR,US);
G03F7/70633 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01N2021/8848 (IL,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM MESSEN EINES INTERESSIERENDEN PARAMETERS MIT BILDEBENENERFASSUNGSTECHNIKEN | [2019/34] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING A PARAMETER OF INTEREST USING IMAGE PLANE DETECTION TECHNIQUES | [2019/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE MESURER UN PARAMÈTRE D'INTÉRÊT AU MOYEN DE TECHNIQUES DE DÉTECTION DE PLAN D'IMAGE | [2019/34] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003206298 (BISCHOFF JOERG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0058] - [0062]; figures 4C-4F * [I] 3-6,9,12-14; | [A]US2004169861 (MIEHER WALTER D [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0086] , [0 98]; figures 4, 5A *; | [X]WO2009156225 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,7,10,11 * paragraphs [0037] - [0052]; figures 2, 4B, 5; claim 1 * | by applicant | US2006033921 | US2006066855 | US2010201963 | US2010328655 | US2011027704 | US2011043791 | US2011069292 | US2011102753 | US2012044470 | US2012123581 | US2012242970 | US2013258310 | US2013271740 | WO2013178422 |