EP3527312 - DEBURRING TOOL FOR DEBURRING TRANSVERSE RECESSES RUNNING OUT OF A MAIN BOREHOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEULE Werkzeug AG Wegenstraße 11 9436 Balgach / CH | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Studer, Harry Strimäderstr. 8 9436 Balgach / CH | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [2023/07] |
Former [2019/34] | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 18157116.7 | 16.02.2018 | [2019/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3527312 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3527312 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/10 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
B23B51/105 (EP,US);
B23B51/101 (KR);
B23C3/12 (US);
B23C5/02 (US);
B23C5/24 (US);
B23D79/04 (CN);
B23B2220/08 (KR,US);
B23B2251/14 (US);
B23C2210/0407 (US);
B23C2210/084 (US);
B23C2210/12 (US);
B23C2220/20 (US);
B23C2245/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] |
Former [2019/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ENTGRATWERKZEUG ZUR ENTGRATUNG VON QUERAUSNEHMUNGEN, DIE VON EINER HAUPTBOHRUNG AUSGEHEN | [2019/34] | English: | DEBURRING TOOL FOR DEBURRING TRANSVERSE RECESSES RUNNING OUT OF A MAIN BOREHOLE | [2019/34] | French: | OUTIL D'ÉBARBAGE DESTINÉ À ÉBARBER DES ÉVIDEMENTS LATÉRAUX, LESQUELS SORTENT D'UN ALÉSAGE PRINCIPAL | [2022/40] |
Former [2019/34] | OUTIL D'ÉBARBAGE DESTINÉ À ÉBARBER LES ÉVIDEMENTS LATÉRAUX, LESQUELS SORTENT D'UN ALÉSAGE PRINCIPAL | Examination procedure | 15.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 25.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 15.02.2023 | EE | 15.02.2023 | FI | 15.02.2023 | HR | 15.02.2023 | LT | 15.02.2023 | LV | 15.02.2023 | MC | 15.02.2023 | NL | 15.02.2023 | PL | 15.02.2023 | RO | 15.02.2023 | RS | 15.02.2023 | SI | 15.02.2023 | SK | 15.02.2023 | SM | 15.02.2023 | AT | 16.02.2023 | IE | 16.02.2023 | LU | 16.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | NO | 15.05.2023 | GR | 16.05.2023 | IS | 15.06.2023 | PT | 15.06.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/11] | DK | 15.02.2023 | |
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
IE | 16.02.2023 | ||
LU | 16.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | DK | 15.02.2023 | |
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
IE | 16.02.2023 | ||
LU | 16.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | DK | 15.02.2023 | |
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
LU | 16.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | DK | 15.02.2023 | |
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
LU | 16.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 15.02.2023 | |
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 15.02.2023 | |
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 15.02.2023 | |
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 15.02.2023 | |
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.02.2023 | |
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.02.2023 | |
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.02.2023 | |
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.02.2023 | |
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19711206 (HEULE ULF [CH]) [Y] 8* figures 1,9 *; | [XDYI]WO2016135283 (BEIER HANS-MICHAEL [DE]) [XD] 1-4,6,7,9-15 * pages 12-22; figures 1-10 * [Y] 8 [I] 5 | by applicant | DE2559145 | DE2525872 | DE2649208 | WO2016135283 |