13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
04.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
10.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
20.03.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
12.02.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
11.02.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.02.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.02.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
15.10.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
27.09.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
18.06.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
12.04.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
12.04.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
12.04.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
21.02.2018 |
Change - representative |
|