EP3527606 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING POLYETHER CARBONATE POLYOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 29.01.2020 [2020/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 18157272.8 | 16.02.2018 | [2019/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3527606 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08G64/34 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
C08G64/34 (EP,US);
C08G65/2603 (EP,US);
C08G64/0208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYETHERCARBONATPOLYOLEN | [2019/34] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING POLYETHER CARBONATE POLYOLS | [2019/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLYÉTHERCARBONATE POLYOLS | [2019/34] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2020/05] | 20.09.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2014033071 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [AD] 1-13* the whole document * | by applicant | US3404109 | US3829505 | US3941849 | JPH04145123 | US5158922 | US5470813 | EP0700949 | EP0743093 | EP0761708 | WO9740086 | WO9816310 | WO0047649 | WO0139883 | WO0180994 | EP1359177 | US7304172 | US2012165549 | WO2014033071 | EP3060596 | - INOUE et al., "Copolymerization of Carbon Dioxide and Epoxide with Organometallic Compounds", Die Makromolekulare Chemie, (19690000), vol. 130, doi:doi:10.1002/macp.1969.021300112, pages 210 - 220, XP001018750 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/macp.1969.021300112 | - S. D. ALLEN, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20020000), vol. 124, page 14284 | - M. R. KEMBER et al., Angew. Chem., Int. Ed., (20090000), vol. 48, page 931 |