EP3366437 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING WRAPPING FROM ROLLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORE LINK AB Box 198 311 22 Falkenberg / SE | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strandh, Nils Vilshärads Ljungväg 27 310 41 GULLBRANDSTORP / SE | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2018/35] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 Carlsgatan 3 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 18157540.8 | 20.02.2018 | [2018/35] | Priority number, date | SE20170050189 | 22.02.2017 Original published format: SE 1750189 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3366437 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3366437 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B26D3/10, B65H19/10 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
B26D1/045 (EP,US);
B65H19/105 (EP,SE,US);
B26D3/10 (EP,US);
B65B69/0025 (SE);
B65B69/0033 (SE,US);
B65H16/08 (US);
B26D2210/11 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4189 (US);
B65H2301/4604 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/14] |
Former [2018/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG DER VERPACKUNG VON ROLLEN | [2018/35] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING WRAPPING FROM ROLLS | [2018/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ENLEVER L'EMBALLAGE DES ROULEAUX | [2018/35] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/14] | 26.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2018 | AL | 11.12.2019 | AT | 11.12.2019 | CY | 11.12.2019 | CZ | 11.12.2019 | DK | 11.12.2019 | EE | 11.12.2019 | ES | 11.12.2019 | FI | 11.12.2019 | HR | 11.12.2019 | LT | 11.12.2019 | LV | 11.12.2019 | MC | 11.12.2019 | MK | 11.12.2019 | MT | 11.12.2019 | NL | 11.12.2019 | PL | 11.12.2019 | RO | 11.12.2019 | RS | 11.12.2019 | SE | 11.12.2019 | SI | 11.12.2019 | SK | 11.12.2019 | SM | 11.12.2019 | TR | 11.12.2019 | IE | 20.02.2020 | LU | 20.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | BG | 11.03.2020 | NO | 11.03.2020 | GR | 12.03.2020 | IS | 11.04.2020 | PT | 06.05.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.02.2018 | |
AL | 11.12.2019 | ||
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CY | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
MT | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.02.2020 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.02.2020 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.02.2020 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
ES | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 11.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]JPS61168495 (ACHILLES CORP) [X] 6,9-11 * the whole document * [A] 1-5 [Y] 8 [I] 7; | [A]JPH04311438 (NIKKA KK) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [YDA]WO9317946 (NETZLER & DAHLGREN ING FIRMAN [SE]) [YD] 8 * abstract * [A] 1-5; | [A]DE19848808 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9317946 |