Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3379292 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2019 | B1 | EP3379292 | 26.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017106217 | 22.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102017106217 | 28.02.2019 | B4 | DE102017106217 | 27.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017106217 | 22.03.2017 |