EP3366253 - DEVICE FOR BIOLOGICAL TISSUE REGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/35] | METHOD FOR BIOLOGICAL TISSURE REGENERATION AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD | ||
[2024/39] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change - German title | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - English title | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - French title | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Khomchanka, Uladzimir Valiantinavich 39-19 Uliyanonskaya st Minsk 220006 / BY | For all designated states Gorbach, Dmitry Vladislavovich 58/1-348 Bajkalskaja st Minsk 220102 / BY | For all designated states Sukhadolau, Aliaksandr Valerjavich 59/1-70 Gazeta «Zviazda» av. Minsk 220117 / BY | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Khomchanka, Uladzimir Valiantinavich Minsk 220006 / BY | 02 /
Gorbach, Dmitry Vladislavovich Minsk 220102 / BY | 03 /
Sukhadolau, Aliaksandr Valerjavich Minsk 220117 / BY | [2024/38] |
Former [2018/35] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Jeck, Anton Jeck & Fleck Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 18158021.8 | 06.09.2012 | [2018/35] | Priority number, date | EA20120000845 | 11.05.2012 Original published format: EA 201200845 | [2018/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3366253 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/20, A61N7/00, A61H23/00 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
A61B18/203 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61N7/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61H23/0245 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61N5/0616 (KR);
A61N5/067 (KR);
A61B2018/00452 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2018/0047 (EP,CN,US);
A61H2201/10 (EP,CN,US);
A61N2007/0034 (EP,CN,US);
A61N2007/0078 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] |
Former [2018/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR BIOLOGISCHEN GEWEBEERNEUERUNG | [2024/39] | English: | DEVICE FOR BIOLOGICAL TISSUE REGENERATION | [2024/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINÉ À LA RÉGÉNÉRATION BIOLOGIQUE DE TISSU | [2024/39] |
Former [2018/35] | VERFAHREN ZUR BIOLOGISCHEN GEWEBEERNEUERUNG UND EINRICHTUNGEN ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | ||
Former [2018/35] | METHOD FOR BIOLOGICAL TISSURE REGENERATION AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD | ||
Former [2018/35] | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGÉNÉRATION BIOLOGIQUE DE TISSU ET DISPOSITIFS DESTINÉS À LA MISE EN UVRE DUDIT PROCÉDÉ | Examination procedure | 22.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 28.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.09.2024 | 12.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12876284.6 / EP2848227 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5423803 (TANKOVICH NIKOLAI I [US], et al); | [X]US5725482 (BISHOP RICHARD P [US]); | [X]US6086580 (MORDON SERGE [FR], et al); | [X]US2002058890 (VISURI STEVEN R [US], et al); | [X]US2002161357 (ANDERSON R ROX [US], et al); | [X]US6595934 (HISSONG JAMES B [US], et al); | [X]US2005085748 (CULP WILLIAM C [US], et al); | [X]US2009069741 (ALTSHULER GREGORY B [US], et al); | [X]WO2012018391 (GUIDED THERAPY SYSTEMS LLC [US], et al) | by applicant | US6997923 | US2011218464 | US2012016239 | US2012053458 |