EP3367177 - IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | [2019/38] |
Former [2018/35] | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebe, Takaaki c/o Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8551 / JP | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2018/35] | Application number, filing date | 18158308.9 | 23.02.2018 | [2018/35] | Priority number, date | JP20170035423 | 27.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017035423 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3367177 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3367177 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/16, // G03G15/00 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
G03G15/1615 (EP,US);
G03G13/16 (US);
G03G13/01 (US);
G03G13/20 (US);
G03G15/168 (EP,US);
G03G15/6564 (EP,US);
G03G15/6585 (EP,US);
G03G15/5008 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00945 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] |
Former [2018/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/35] | English: | IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS | [2018/35] | French: | APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2018/35] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 28.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2018 | AL | 29.01.2020 | AT | 29.01.2020 | CY | 29.01.2020 | CZ | 29.01.2020 | DK | 29.01.2020 | EE | 29.01.2020 | ES | 29.01.2020 | FI | 29.01.2020 | HR | 29.01.2020 | IT | 29.01.2020 | LT | 29.01.2020 | LV | 29.01.2020 | MC | 29.01.2020 | MK | 29.01.2020 | MT | 29.01.2020 | PL | 29.01.2020 | RO | 29.01.2020 | RS | 29.01.2020 | SE | 29.01.2020 | SI | 29.01.2020 | SK | 29.01.2020 | SM | 29.01.2020 | TR | 29.01.2020 | IE | 23.02.2020 | LU | 23.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | BG | 29.04.2020 | NO | 29.04.2020 | GR | 30.04.2020 | IS | 29.05.2020 | PT | 21.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 23.02.2018 | |
AL | 29.01.2020 | ||
AT | 29.01.2020 | ||
CY | 29.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
MT | 29.01.2020 | ||
PL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
TR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IE | 23.02.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.02.2018 | |
AT | 29.01.2020 | ||
CY | 29.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
MT | 29.01.2020 | ||
PL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
TR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IE | 23.02.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.01.2020 | |
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
PL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
IE | 23.02.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
IE | 23.02.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 29.01.2020 | |
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 29.01.2020 | |
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
NO | 29.04.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP2006078883 (CANON KK) [YD] 7 * paragraph [0032]; figures 1-14 *; | [A]EP2071408 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2012051816 (CHIYODA YASUHARU [JP]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0093] - [0095]; figures 1-14 *; | [A]US2013195487 (YAMASHITA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XYI]US2015309440 (ISHII TAKESHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0045] , [0 58] , [0 59] , [0 62] , [0 79] , [0 87] , [0 89] , [0 90]; figures 1-18 * [Y] 7 [I] 3,4 | Examination | US2008160435 | by applicant | JP2006078883 |