EP3375571 - SENSOR SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRIC SCREWDRIVER FOR CLASSIFYING SCREW PROCESSES BY MEANS OF A MAGNETIC FIELD SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2018/38] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nickel, Christian Meisenstraße 3 90513 Zirndorf / DE | 02 /
Seitz, Jochen Hirschberger Str. 53 90559 Burgthann / DE | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Pfitzner, Hannes, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 18158384.0 | 23.02.2018 | [2018/38] | Priority number, date | DE201710202976 | 23.02.2017 Original published format: DE102017202976 | [2018/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3375571 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3375571 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3375571 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B25B21/00, B25F5/00 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
B25B21/00 (EP);
B25F5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] |
Former [2018/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SENSORIK FÜR EINEN ELEKTROSCHRAUBER ZUR KLASSIFIZIERUNG VON SCHRAUBVORGÄNGEN MITTELS EINES MAGNETFELDSENSORS | [2018/38] | English: | SENSOR SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTRIC SCREWDRIVER FOR CLASSIFYING SCREW PROCESSES BY MEANS OF A MAGNETIC FIELD SENSOR | [2018/38] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE CAPTEURS POUR UN TOURNEVIS ÉLECTRIQUE PERMETTANT DE CLASSIFIER LES PROCESSUS DE VISSAGE AU MOYEN D'UN CAPTEUR DE CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE | [2018/38] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 09.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.01.2023 | 17.01.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | MC | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 05.07.2023 | |
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SI | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 05.07.2023 | |
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 05.07.2023 | |
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 05.07.2023 | |
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 05.07.2023 | |
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 05.07.2023 | |
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006155582 (BROWN STEPHEN J [US]) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0042] *; | [X]DE102006053091 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0014] *; | [Y]DE102009027587 (HILTI AG [LI]) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0015] *; | [Y]US2011114345 (SCHLESAK GERD [DE], et al) [Y] 9 * [0007], [0009], [0026] *; | [Y]US8004664 (ETTER MARK A [US], et al) [Y] 15 * column 21, line 60 - column 22, line 2 ** column 50, line 56 - column 51, line 9 *; | [X]DE102011087361 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0050] *; | [Y]US2013189041 (ABE SATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 15 * [0039], [0049], [0051], [0091] *; | [Y]DE102012224407 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 14 * [0002], [0019] *; | [XI]EP2871029 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [X] 1,10,16,17 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0035] * [I] 2-7; | [Y]US2016299526 (INAGAKI PHILIPPE [US], et al) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0100] *; | [XYI]DE102016108841 (MAKITA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,11,16,17 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0093] * [Y] 9,12-15 [I] 2-7; | [X]DE102015215362 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0021] * | Examination | WO2012177751 |