EP3370132 - SUPPORT DEVICE FOR PAYMENT TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Banks and Acquirers International Holding 28-32 boulevard de Grenelle 75015 Paris / FR | [2022/12] |
Former [2018/36] | For all designated states INGENICO GROUP 28-32 Boulevard de Grenelle 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUX, Julien 7 chemin de la vire 69300 CALUIRE / FR | 02 /
ROBERT, Franck 3 avenue du Maréchal Juin 92150 Suresnes / FR | 03 /
DEDIEU, Philippe 14 rue Einstein 07500 GUILHERAND-GRANGES / FR | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/36] | 01 /
ROUX, Julien 7 chemin de la vire 69300 CALUIRE / FR | ||
02 /
ROBERT, Franck 95B Rue de Charone 75011 PARIS / FR | |||
03 /
DEDIEU, Philippe 14 rue Einstein 07500 GUILHERAND-GRANGES / FR | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/36] | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18158445.9 | 23.02.2018 | [2018/36] | Priority number, date | FR20170051720 | 02.03.2017 Original published format: FR 1751720 | [2018/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3370132 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3370132 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G06F1/18, G07G1/00, F16M11/08, H02G3/08, H02G3/10 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
G06F1/1632 (EP,US);
H05K5/0247 (US);
F16M11/08 (US);
G06F1/181 (EP,US);
G07G1/0018 (EP,US);
H05K5/0234 (US);
F16M2200/08 (US);
G06F2200/1639 (EP,US);
H02G3/083 (EP,US);
H02G3/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/36] | G06F1/16, G07G1/00, F16M11/08, H02G3/08, G06F1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] |
Former [2018/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HALTERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR ZAHLUNGSENDGERÄT | [2018/36] | English: | SUPPORT DEVICE FOR PAYMENT TERMINAL | [2018/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT POUR TERMINAL DE PAIEMENT | [2018/36] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 07.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2021 | 06.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.06.2022 | AT | 01.06.2022 | CZ | 01.06.2022 | DK | 01.06.2022 | EE | 01.06.2022 | FI | 01.06.2022 | HR | 01.06.2022 | IT | 01.06.2022 | LT | 01.06.2022 | LV | 01.06.2022 | MC | 01.06.2022 | NL | 01.06.2022 | PL | 01.06.2022 | RO | 01.06.2022 | RS | 01.06.2022 | SE | 01.06.2022 | SI | 01.06.2022 | SK | 01.06.2022 | SM | 01.06.2022 | BG | 01.09.2022 | NO | 01.09.2022 | GR | 02.09.2022 | IS | 01.10.2022 | PT | 03.10.2022 | IE | 23.02.2023 | LU | 23.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
IE | 23.02.2023 | ||
LU | 23.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
LU | 23.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9706716 (VERIFONE INC [US], et al) [A] 1,6-9 * abstract * * page 10, line 12 - line 25; figures 2, 7 * * page 12, line 15 - page 14, line 10; figures 4-10 *; | [A]US5802459 (BURKE RANDAL A [US], et al) [A] 6-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 11 - line 46; figures 3-5 *; | [A]US2005213295 (PEREZ JUAN M [US], et al) [A] 5 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1A, 1B * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1A, 1B, 3-6 *; | [I]US2006133016 (NORTH KEN [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0020]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0028]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052]; figures 7, 9 *; | [A]US2008042020 (LAITILA ANDY [CA], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0090]; figures 1-5 ** paragraph [0098]; figure 13 *; | [A]US2009057502 (TAKAMATSU MUTSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0082]; figures 2, 7, 8 *; | [A]WO2016039778 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029]; figures 3, 4 * | Examination | US7546019 |