EP3531446 - SEMICONDUCTOR MODULE, ELECTRONIC COMPONENT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SEMICONDUCTOR MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies Austria AG Siemensstrasse 2 9500 Villach / AT | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAVETTE, Danny 80 Tillinghast Road Greene, 02827 / US | 02 /
FEIL, Thomas Hugo-Wolf-Strasse 4a 9523 Villach / AT | 03 /
VON KOBLINSKI, Carsten Auenweg 175 9500 Villach / AT | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Moore, Derek Jensen & Son 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 18158473.1 | 23.02.2018 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3531446 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3531446 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/78, H01L21/56, H01L27/088, H01L21/683, H01L23/00, H01L23/31 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
H01L21/78 (EP,US);
H01L25/0655 (KR);
H01L21/56 (CN,US);
H01L24/08 (US);
H01L21/4857 (US);
H01L21/486 (US);
H01L21/561 (EP,US);
H01L21/6835 (EP,US);
H01L23/293 (KR,US);
H01L23/31 (KR);
H01L23/3135 (US);
H01L23/3178 (US);
H01L23/3185 (US);
H01L23/481 (CN);
H01L23/482 (CN);
H01L23/495 (KR);
H01L23/525 (KR);
H01L23/5383 (US);
H01L23/5384 (US);
H01L23/5389 (US);
H01L24/03 (US);
H01L24/05 (US);
H01L24/06 (KR,US);
H01L24/24 (EP,US);
H01L24/25 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L24/82 (EP,US);
H01L24/96 (EP,US);
H01L25/072 (CN,US);
H01L25/16 (CN,US);
H01L25/18 (CN);
H01L27/088 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68327 (EP,US);
H01L2221/6834 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0231 (CN,US);
H01L2224/0233 (US);
H01L2224/02331 (CN);
H01L2224/02381 (CN,US);
H01L2224/04042 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05553 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05647 (US);
H01L2224/0603 (EP,US);
H01L2224/06181 (EP);
H01L2224/06182 (US);
H01L2224/08137 (US);
H01L2224/24105 (EP,US);
H01L2224/24137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2518 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49175 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73227 (EP,US);
H01L23/3107 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/245, H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13055, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/13091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/35] | H01L21/78, H01L21/56, H01L27/088 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] |
Former [2019/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HALBLEITERMODUL, ELEKTRONISCHE KOMPONENTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HALBLEITERMODULS | [2019/35] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR MODULE, ELECTRONIC COMPONENT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SEMICONDUCTOR MODULE | [2019/35] | French: | MODULE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MODULE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2019/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 28.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015221523 (ZUNDEL MARKUS [DE], et al); | [I]US2016225717 (PALM PETTERI [DE], et al) | by applicant | US2013140673 |