EP3530804 - LATEX BONDED TEXTILE FIBER STRUCTURE FOR CONSTRUCTION APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthomer Deutschland GmbH Werrastrasse 10 45768 Marl / DE | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABELE, Alexandra Alter Ostdamm 70 48249 Dülmen / DE | 02 /
BUTZ, Sören Die Nielen 35 48249 Dülmen / DE | 03 /
GEHR, Andreas Obertshäuser Str. 59 63165 Mülheim a.M. / DE | 04 /
DRIEVER, Martin Cloppenburger Weg 13 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
KARNOP, Michael Stuckenbusch Straße 143 45659 Recklinghausen / DE | 06 /
LUDWIG, Peter Haddings Berg 9 46284 Dorsten / DE | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 18158774.2 | 27.02.2018 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3530804 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3530804 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D06N5/00, D06N3/10, E04B1/66, C03C25/27 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
D06N5/00 (EP,US);
C08J5/046 (US);
C03C25/27 (EP,US);
C08J5/043 (US);
C08J5/08 (US);
C08L9/08 (US);
D04H1/587 (EP,US);
D04H1/64 (EP,US);
D06N3/103 (EP,US);
E04B1/665 (EP,US);
C08J2309/08 (US);
C08J2467/00 (US);
C08L2205/16 (US);
D04H1/641 (US);
D06N2211/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] |
Former [2019/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LATEXGEBUNDENE TEXTILFASERSTRUKTUR FÜR BAUANWENDUNGEN | [2019/35] | English: | LATEX BONDED TEXTILE FIBER STRUCTURE FOR CONSTRUCTION APPLICATIONS | [2019/35] | French: | STRUCTURE DE FIBRE TEXTILE LIÉE AU LATEX POUR DES APPLICATIONS DE CONSTRUCTION | [2019/35] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 27.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH08269115 ; | [XYI]US3650810 (MARZOCCHI ALFRED) [X] 1-4,10,13-15 * column 1, line 1 - line 29 * * column 1, line 45 - line 54 * * examples 4-6,10,11 * [Y] 6,9,12 [I] 5,11; | [Y]US4959249 (SCHILLING BERND [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 38 - line 51 *; | [Y]US2003100674 (MUELLER GUNTHER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * claims 8,12,14,15 *; | [Y]EP2431396 (CELANESE EMULSIONS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0001] ** paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] *; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 51, Database accession no. 1996-515029, XP002783590 & JPH08269115 A 19961015 (SANYO CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1-4,6,13-15 * abstract * * table 1 * [I] 5,7,8 | by applicant | DE1905256 | US3563946 | US3575913 | GB1517595 | US4472086 | US4478974 | US4504539 | DE3347280 | EP0160609 | EP0176847 | US4751111 | EP0281643 | EP0333602 | EP0395548 | US4968740 | EP1114849 | US6313253 | WO0242344 | WO2007024683 | WO2008008868 | WO2008150647 | WO2010019338 | US2011214796 | EP2231917 | WO2016193646 | WO2017164726 |