EP3373244 - AUTOMATIC EARDRUM REGISTRATION FROM LIGHT FIELD DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2020/19] |
Former [2018/37] | For all designated states Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARYGIANNI, Sofia c/o Ecole Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne (EPFL) EPFL Innovation Park J 1015 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
TOSIC, Ivana c/o Ricoh Innovations Corporation 10050 N. Wolfe Road, Suite SW2-260 Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 03 /
BEDARD, Noah c/o Ricoh Innovations Corporation 10050 N. Wolfe Road, Suite SW2-260 Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 04 /
SPINOULAS, Leonidas c/o Ricoh Innovations Corporation 10050 N. Wolfe Road, Suite SW2-260 Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 05 /
MARTINELLO, Manuel c/o Ricoh Innovations Corporation 10050 N. Wolfe Road, Suite SW2-260 Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US | 06 /
FROSSARD, Pascal c/o Ecole Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne (EPFL) EPFL Innovation Park J 1015 Lausanne / CH | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18159173.6 | 28.02.2018 | [2018/37] | Priority number, date | US201715452613 | 07.03.2017 Original published format: US201715452613 | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3373244 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3373244 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T7/33, A61B1/227 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
A61B1/000094 (EP,US);
A61B1/227 (EP,US);
G06F18/2323 (US);
G06T3/40 (US);
G06T7/0014 (EP,US);
G06T7/33 (US);
G06T7/344 (EP,US);
G06V20/64 (US);
G06T2207/10028 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE TROMMELFELLREGISTRIERUNG AUS LICHTFELDDATEN | [2018/37] | English: | AUTOMATIC EARDRUM REGISTRATION FROM LIGHT FIELD DATA | [2018/37] | French: | ENREGISTREMENT AUTOMATIQUE DE TYMPAN À PARTIR DE DONNÉES DE CHAMP LUMINEUX | [2018/37] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 28.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011058466 (KWON JOON-HWAN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-3,12-14 * paragraphs [0073] , [0076] ** paragraphs [0059] , [0060] *; | [YA]US2014316238 (BERKNER KATHRIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,12-14 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] * * claim 18 * [A] 4-11; | [A] - JAN A N BUYTAERT ET AL, "Realistic 3D Computer Model of the Gerbil Middle Ear, Featuring Accurate Morphology of Bone and Soft Tissue Structures", JOURNAL OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN OTOLARYNGOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20110713), vol. 12, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S10162-011-0281-4, ISSN 1438-7573, pages 681 - 696, XP019976667 [A] 1 * page 685, column l, line 29 - line 35 * * page 683, column r, line 45 - line 47 * * page 683, column r, line 55 - page 684, column l, line 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10162-011-0281-4 | by applicant | US9460515 | US9569853 |