EP3536993 - SLIDE BEARING SYSTEM, PLANETARY GEAR, WIND POWER PLANT AND INDUSTRIAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 18159966.3 | 05.03.2018 | [2019/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3536993 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16C17/10, F16C33/10, F16H57/08, F16H57/04, // F03D80/70 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
F16C17/10 (EP);
F16C33/106 (EP);
F16H57/0427 (EP);
F16H57/0479 (EP);
F16H57/0486 (EP);
F16H57/082 (EP);
F03D15/00 (EP);
F03D80/70 (EP);
F05B2240/50 (EP);
F05B2260/40311 (EP);
F05B2260/98 (EP);
F16C17/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEITLAGERSYSTEM, PLANETENGETRIEBE, WINDKRAFTANLAGE UND INDUSTRIEANWENDUNG | [2019/37] | English: | SLIDE BEARING SYSTEM, PLANETARY GEAR, WIND POWER PLANT AND INDUSTRIAL USE | [2019/37] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PALIER LISSE, ENGRENAGE PLANÉTAIRE, ÉOLIENNE ET APPLICATION INDUSTRIELLE | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2020/10] | 30.09.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1090941 (PINUS IOSIF YA, et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,10-12,15 * figure 1 *; | [XA]WO2009141140 (GIGER URS [CH]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-15 * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0116]; figures 1-3 * [A] 8; | [XA]EP2662598 (ZF WIND POWER ANTWERPEN NV [BE]) [X] 1-4,8,10-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0065]; figures 8-18 * [A] 5; | [X]DE102013221265 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5,8,10-15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0052]; figure 13 *; | [A]CN105422745 (NANJING HIGH SPEED GEAR MFG CO LTD) [A] 1,2,10-15* figures 1-3 *; | [XA]DE102016219800 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,10-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-4; | [E]WO2018059982 (FLENDER GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-15 * page 17, line 16 - page 19, line 37; figures 1-5 *; | [E]WO2018059984 (FLENDER GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-15 * page 18, line 8 - page 19, line 24 * | by applicant | DE2702321 | EP2383480 | US2015369284 |