EP3536492 - COMPOSITE WIND TURBINE BLADE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 18160150.1 | 06.03.2018 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3536492 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B29D99/00, B29C70/34, B29C70/44, F03D1/06, // B29K75/00, B29L31/08, B29K63/00 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
B29D99/0028 (EP);
B29C70/342 (EP);
B29C70/443 (EP);
F03D1/0675 (EP);
B29K2063/00 (EP);
B29K2075/00 (EP);
B29L2031/085 (EP);
F05B2280/6015 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENGESETZTE WINDTURBINENSCHAUFEL SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/37] | English: | COMPOSITE WIND TURBINE BLADE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2019/37] | French: | PALE DE TURBINE ÉOLIENNE COMPOSITE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET SON APPLICATION | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 19.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2020/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2016146185 (YARBROUGH AARON A [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0003] , [0030]; figures 2,3; claims 1,2,8,9 * [A] 7; | [I]EP3106656 (ALSTOM RENEWABLE TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [I] 7-10 * paragraphs [0058] - [0064]; claim 12 *; | [A]US2011223032 (TOBIN JAMES ROBERT [US]) [A] 3,7 * paragraph [0046]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2007140861 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] *; | [AD]WO2015155195 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [AD] 4,8,9 * page 16, lines 6,7 * * page 19, line last line - page 20, line 1; claims 1,2,8 * | by applicant | US2012244006 | WO2015155195 | US2016040651 |