EP3536330 - INFANT & TODDLER FORMULA CONTAINING A VIRUS PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jennewein, Stefan Wichfriedweg 14 53604 Bad Honnef / DE | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 18160465.3 | 07.03.2018 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3536330 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/76, A61P3/02 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
A61P3/02 (EP);
C12N7/00 (EP);
C12N2795/00021 (EP);
C12N2795/00031 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SÄUGLINGS- UND KLEINKINDERNAHRUNG MIT EINEM VIRUSPRÄPARAT | [2019/37] | English: | INFANT & TODDLER FORMULA CONTAINING A VIRUS PREPARATION | [2019/37] | French: | FORMULE POUR ENFANT ET NOURRISSONS CONTENANT UNE PRÉPARATION VIRALE | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2017053327 (SAN DIEGO STATE UNIV (SDSU) FOUND DBA SAN DIEGO STATE UNIV RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1-17 *cf. abstract, page 1, lines 15-34, page 7, lines 10-24, page 12, last para. bridging with line 2 at page 13, page 22, line 24 bridging with line 8 on page 23, furthermore last para. of page 23, claim 4*; | [X]WO2016081645 (SAN DIEGO STATE UNIVERSITY SDSU FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 1-17 *cf. abstract, page 3, lines 9 and 10, page 7, line 14 bridging with line 12 at page 8, claims 1 and 2*; | [I]WO2014049008 (FIXED PHAGE LTD [GB]) [I] 1-17 *cf. abstract, page 3, last para., page 4, last para., page 15, last para. extending to line 3 at page 16, claims 1 and 6*; | [A] - SEKOWSKA A ET AL, "Sulfur metabolism in Escherichia coli and related bacteria: Facts and fiction", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, HORIZON SCIENTIFIC PRESS, WYMONDHAM, GB, (20000401), vol. 2, no. 2, ISSN 1464-1801, pages 145 - 177, XP002242976 [A] 1-17 *cf. summary at page 13* | by applicant | - URASHIMA, T. et al., "Milk Oligosaccharides", Nova Biomedial Books, (20110000), ISBN 978-1-61122-831-1 | - "Harnessing milk oligosaccharides for nutraceutical applications", HICKEY, R. et al., Dairy-derived ingredients. Food and neutraceutical uses, (20090000), pages 308 - 343 | - "Formulation guidelines for infant formula", GUO M., Human milk biochemistry and infant formula manufacturing technology, Woodhead Publishing, (20140000), pages 141 - 171 | - "Microencapsulation for Gastrointestinal Delivery of probiotic bacteria", KASIPATHY K., Nano- and Microencapsulation for Foods, Wiley Blackwell, (20140000), pages 167 - 197 | - "Encapsulation of probiotics for us in food products", MANOIJLOVIC et al., Encapsulation technologies for active food ingredients and food processing, Springer New York, (20090000), pages 269 - 302 | - FURUTA et al., "Characterization and application of lytic bacteriophages against Campylobacter jejuni isolated from poultry in Japan", Biocontrol. Science, (20170000), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 213 - 221 | - CARVALHO et al., "Method for bacteriophage isolation against target Campylobacter strains", Letters in Applied Microbiology, (20090000), vol. 50, pages 192 - 197 | - GRAJEWSKI et al., "Development of a bacteriophage typing system for Campylobacter jejuni and Campylobacter coli", J. Clin. Microbiol., (19850000), vol. 22, pages 13 - 18, XP002442976 | - ATTERBURY et al., "Isolation and characterization of campylobacter bacteriophages from retail poultry", Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (20030000), vol. 69, doi:doi:10.1128/AEM.69.8.4511-4518.2003, pages 4511 - 4518, XP002313915 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.69.8.4511-4518.2003 | - CONNERTON et al., "Longitudinal study of Campylobacter jejuni bacteriophages and their hosts from broiler chickens", Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (20040000), vol. 70, doi:doi:10.1128/AEM.70.7.3877-3883.2004, pages 3877 - 3883, XP002313914 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.70.7.3877-3883.2004 | - EI-SHIBINY et al., "Enumeration and diversity of campylobacters and bacteriophages isolated during the rearing cycles of free-range and organic chickens", Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (20050000), vol. 71, doi:doi:10.1128/AEM.71.3.1259-1266.2005, pages 1259 - 1266, XP002404410 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.71.3.1259-1266.2005 | - HANSEN et al., "Characterization of Campylobacter phages including analysis of host range by selected Campylobacter Penner serotypes", BMC Microbiol., (20070000), vol. 7, page 90, XP021033264 | - LOC CARRILLO et al., "Free-range layer chickens as a source of Campylobacter bacteriophage", Antonie Van Leewenhoek, (20070000), vol. 92, doi:doi:10.1007/s10482-007-9156-4, pages 275 - 284, XP019523315 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10482-007-9156-4 | - OWENS et al., "The isolation and characterization of Campylobacter jejuni bacteriophages from free range and indoor poultry", Vet. Microbiol., (20120000), vol. 162, no. 1, pages 144 - 150 | - SALAMA et al., "Improved method for the isolation of Campylobacter jejuni and Campylobacter coli bacteriophages", Lett. Appl. Microbiol., (19890000), vol. 8, pages 5 - 7, XP008002844 |