Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9150396 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2015 | B2 | US2012185121 | 19.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009228331 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010JP02642 | 12.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2484547 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2017 | A4 | EP2484547 | 08.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009228331 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010JP02642 | 12.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102548792B | Global Dossier | 25.02.2015 | B | CN102548792 | 04.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009228331 | 30.09.2009 | WO2010JP02642 | 12.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3388281 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2020 | B1 | EP3388281 | 21.11.2018 | A3 | EP3388281 | 17.10.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2009228331 | 30.09.2009 | EP10820028 | 12.04.2010 | WO2010JP02642 | 12.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011039901 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009228331 | 30.09.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5204073B | Global Dossier | 05.06.2013 | B2 | JP2011078241 | 14.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009228331 | 30.09.2009 | Type | Earlier application | EP2484547 |