EP3360571 - ANTIBODIES BINDING TO AN INTRACELLULAR PRL-1 OR PRL-3 POLYPEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agency For Science, Technology And Research (A*star) 1 Fusionopolis Way 20-10 Connexis Singapore 138632 / SG | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Qi 61 Biopolis Drive Proteos 138632 Singapore / SG | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2020/51] |
Former [2018/33] | Salisbury, Frances, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 18160806.8 | 03.05.2008 | [2018/33] | Priority number, date | US20070924201P | 03.05.2007 Original published format: US 924201 P | US20080064229P | 22.02.2008 Original published format: US 64229 P | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3360571 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3360571 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C07K16/18, C07K16/30, C07K16/40 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61K39/395 (GB);
A61K39/3955 (GB);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP,CN,GB,US);
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
C12N15/52 (GB);
C12N5/0693 (GB);
G01N33/5005 (GB);
G01N33/53 (GB);
G01N33/57496 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/56 (CN,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/45] |
Former [2018/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AN EIN INTRAZELLULARES PRL-1- ODER PRL-3-POLYPEPTID BINDENDE ANTIKÖRPER | [2018/33] | English: | ANTIBODIES BINDING TO AN INTRACELLULAR PRL-1 OR PRL-3 POLYPEPTIDE | [2018/33] | French: | ANTICORPS À LIAISON SUR UN POLYPEPTIDE PRL-1 OU PRL-3 INTRACELLULAIRE | [2018/33] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 28.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08754007.6 / EP2150276 | EP12159080.6 / EP2529754 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 29.05.2019 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.05.2008 | CY | 16.12.2020 | CZ | 16.12.2020 | EE | 16.12.2020 | HR | 16.12.2020 | LT | 16.12.2020 | LV | 16.12.2020 | MC | 16.12.2020 | MT | 16.12.2020 | PL | 16.12.2020 | RO | 16.12.2020 | SI | 16.12.2020 | SK | 16.12.2020 | BG | 16.03.2021 | GR | 17.03.2021 | IS | 16.04.2021 | PT | 16.04.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 03.05.2008 | |
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | CY | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HR | 16.12.2020 | |
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 16.12.2020 | |
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 16.12.2020 | |
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005287644 (CHIU YI-FANG [TW], et al); | [A]WO2006091326 (ATTOGEN INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US3791932 | US3839153 | US3850752 | US3850578 | US3853987 | US3867517 | US3879262 | US3901654 | US3935074 | US3984533 | US3996345 | US4034074 | US4098876 | EP0088695 | US4683195 | US4683202 | WO8807378 | US4879219 | US5011771 | WO9111201 | US5281521 | WO9521927 | WO9530018 | US6100090 | WO1995GB00322 |