EP3373614 - NETWORK CONTROLLED CACHING BY USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPCom GmbH & Co. KG Zugspitzstrasse 15 82049 Pullach / DE | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANS, Martin Lavesring 10 31162 Bad Salzdetfurth / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Andreas Alter Weg 2 38124 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
LUFT, Achim Maibaumstraße 7h 38118 Braunschweig / DE | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | [2018/37] | Application number, filing date | 18160959.5 | 09.03.2018 | [2018/37] | Priority number, date | EP20170160238 | 10.03.2017 Original published format: EP 17160238 | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3373614 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06, H04L29/08, H04L12/24, H04W8/22, H04W8/24, // H04N21/258, H04N21/433, G06F17/30, H04L12/18, H04N21/40, H04N21/437, H04N21/45, H04L29/06, H04W88/02, H04W88/08, H04M15/00 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
H04W4/06 (EP);
G06F16/22 (EP);
H04L12/14 (EP);
H04L67/289 (EP);
H04L67/568 (EP);
H04M15/61 (EP);
H04M15/68 (EP);
H04W4/24 (EP);
H04W8/22 (EP);
H04W8/24 (EP);
H04W8/245 (EP);
G06F16/9574 (EP);
H04L12/1859 (EP);
H04L12/189 (EP);
H04L41/0823 (EP);
H04L65/611 (EP);
H04L65/612 (EP);
H04L65/613 (EP);
H04L67/5681 (EP);
H04L67/5682 (EP);
H04N21/2223 (EP);
H04N21/23106 (EP);
H04N21/23113 (EP);
H04N21/2747 (EP);
H04N21/40 (EP);
H04N21/4331 (EP);
H04N21/437 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NETZWERKGESTEUERTE ZWISCHENSPEICHERUNG DURCH EIN BENUTZERGERÄT | [2018/37] | English: | NETWORK CONTROLLED CACHING BY USER EQUIPMENT | [2018/37] | French: | MISE EN MÉMOIRE CACHE COMMANDÉE PAR RÉSEAU PAR UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | [2018/37] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/34] | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010267403 (LUNGARO PIETRO [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0036] , [0038] , [0041] , [0043] - [0048] * * paragraphs [0052] , [0063] , [0065] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0077] ** figure 1 *; | [I]US2015372933 (CAI XUEJUN [CN], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0006] * * paragraphs [0012] - [0016] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0050] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0062] , [0065] , [0066] * * figures 1,2A-2C,3-5,7,9 * | by applicant | US2010287052 | US2011040718 | US2013150015 | US8582508 | US8671162 | US8812651 | US8825754 | US8874781 | - GOLREZAAEI et al., "Base-Station Assisted Device-to-Device Communications for High-Throughput Wireless Video Networks", IEEE Transactions on Wireless Communications, (20130400), vol. 13, no. 7 |