EP3372192 - DENTAL BLANK POSITIONING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Dental Science LLC 15703 N. 83rd Way Suite 101 Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | [2019/39] |
Former [2018/37] | For all designated states Grobbee, Johannes Petrus Michael Ringbaan-Noord 7 5013 EA Tilburg / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROBBEE, Johannes Petrus Michael c/o Ringbaan-Noord 7 5013 EA Tilburg / NL | [2020/46] |
Former [2019/39] | 01 /
GROBBEE, Johannes Petrus Michael Ringbaan-Noord 7 5013 EA Tilburg / NL | ||
Former [2018/37] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2018/37] | Application number, filing date | 18161215.1 | 12.03.2018 | [2018/37] | Priority number, date | US201762469995P | 10.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762469995 P | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3372192 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3372192 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/00, B23Q1/25 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
A61C13/0022 (EP);
B23Q1/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] |
Former [2018/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZAHNROHLINGPOSITIONIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/37] | English: | DENTAL BLANK POSITIONING DEVICE | [2018/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT D'ÉBAUCHE DENTAIRE | [2018/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 12.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2018 | AL | 11.11.2020 | AT | 11.11.2020 | CY | 11.11.2020 | CZ | 11.11.2020 | DK | 11.11.2020 | EE | 11.11.2020 | ES | 11.11.2020 | FI | 11.11.2020 | HR | 11.11.2020 | IT | 11.11.2020 | LT | 11.11.2020 | LV | 11.11.2020 | MC | 11.11.2020 | MK | 11.11.2020 | MT | 11.11.2020 | PL | 11.11.2020 | RO | 11.11.2020 | RS | 11.11.2020 | SE | 11.11.2020 | SI | 11.11.2020 | SK | 11.11.2020 | SM | 11.11.2020 | BG | 11.02.2021 | NO | 11.02.2021 | GR | 12.02.2021 | IS | 11.03.2021 | PT | 11.03.2021 | IE | 12.03.2021 | LU | 12.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | FR | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 12.03.2018 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
MK | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 12.03.2021 | ||
LU | 12.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 12.03.2018 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 12.03.2021 | ||
LU | 12.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 12.03.2021 | ||
LU | 12.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 12.03.2021 | ||
LU | 12.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 12.03.2021 | ||
LU | 12.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 12.03.2021 | ||
LU | 12.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 12.03.2021 | ||
LU | 12.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 12.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 11.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1798459 (POLOPLAST GMBH & CO KG [AT]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 2 - page 3; figures 1, 2 *[A] 5,7-18; | [XA]DE102006023673 (AEPSILON RECHTEVERWALTUNG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7-11,13,14,16,17 * page 2 - page 6; figures 1-3 * [A] 4,6; | [XA]EP2403427 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3,5-18 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0087]; figures 1-9 * [A] 4; | [XA]US2013216323 (RECK MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 1 - page 3; figures 1-3 * [A] 4,7-18; | [XPA]EP3216420 (STEGER HEINRICH [IT]) [XP] 1-3,5-11,13-18 * column 1 - column 7; figures 1-7b * [A] 4,12; | [XPA]EP3284438 (SHOFU INC [JP]) [XP] 1-3,5,16-18 * page 2 - page 9; figures 1-10D * [A] 4,7-15 | Examination | DE202010001125U | US2014147225 | EP3332738 |