Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023405234 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | US202217728165 | 25.04.2022 | US201916560652 | 04.09.2019 | WO2014EP58969 | 02.05.2014 | US201514783174 | 08.10.2015 | US202318460316 | 01.09.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11779709 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2023 | B2 | US2022241514 | 04.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | US202217728165 | 25.04.2022 | US201916560652 | 04.09.2019 | WO2014EP58969 | 02.05.2014 | US201514783174 | 08.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11400231 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2022 | B2 | US2020023138 | 23.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | US201916560652 | 04.09.2019 | WO2014EP58969 | 02.05.2014 | US201514783174 | 08.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10420897 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2019 | B2 | US2016030680 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | WO2014EP58969 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7398398B | Global Dossier | 14.12.2023 | B2 | JP2021058712 | 15.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019010743 | 25.01.2019 | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6505083B | Global Dossier | 24.04.2019 | B2 | JP2016517753 | 20.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | WO2014EP58969 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4427775 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | EP20153721 | 02.05.2014 | WO2014EP58969 | 02.05.2014 | EP14720626 | 02.05.2014 | EP18161324 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3736003 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2024 | C0 | EP3736003 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2024 | B1 | EP3736003 | 11.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | WO2014EP58969 | 02.05.2014 | EP14720626 | 02.05.2014 | EP18161324 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2994179 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2018 | B1 | EP2994179 | 16.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | WO2014EP58969 | 02.05.2014 | EP14720626 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110585529B | Global Dossier | 14.12.2021 | B | CN110585529 | 20.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | CN201480025464 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105188812B | Global Dossier | 08.10.2019 | B | CN105188812 | 23.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | WO2014EP58969 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3366339 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2020 | B1 | EP3366339 | 29.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | WO2014EP58969 | 02.05.2014 | EP14720626 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2994179T | 18.06.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | WO2014EP58969 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3366339T | 25.05.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | EP14720626 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1215404 | 26.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | WO2014EP58969 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014180744 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6887455B | Global Dossier | 16.06.2021 | B2 | JP2019076762 | 23.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR201808342T | 23.07.2018 | T4 | Priority number | Date | EP13166723 | 07.05.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP3736003 | Type | Earlier application | EP2994179 |