EP3366339 - AN INJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEASEY, Robert 31 Lonsdale Road Lillington Leamington Spa, Warwickshire CV32 7EP / GB | 02 /
PLUMPTRE, David Aubrey 36 Shire Way Droitwich Spa, Worcestershire WR9 7RQ / GB | 03 /
DRAPER, Paul Richard 2 Clyde Avenue Southbourne, Dorset WR11 3FE / GB | 04 /
MERCER, David Richard 36 Irving Road Southbourne, Dorset / GB | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Beasley, Benjamin Oliver, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | McDougall, James, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18161324.1 | 02.05.2014 | [2018/35] | Priority number, date | EP20130166723 | 07.05.2013 Original published format: EP 13166723 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3366339 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3366339 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
A61M5/3155 (EP,US);
A61M5/31568 (US);
A61M2205/3327 (EP,US);
A61M2205/505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] |
Former [2018/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINE INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/35] | English: | AN INJECTION DEVICE | [2018/35] | French: | UN DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION | [2018/35] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 28.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14720626.2 / EP2994179 | Divisional application(s) | EP20153721.4 / EP3736003 | EP24184270.7 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2014 | AL | 04.03.2020 | AT | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | ES | 04.03.2020 | FI | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | IT | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | NL | 04.03.2020 | PL | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SE | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | IE | 02.05.2020 | LU | 02.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | PT | 29.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 02.05.2014 | |
AL | 04.03.2020 | ||
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 02.05.2020 | ||
LU | 02.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 02.05.2014 | |
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 02.05.2020 | ||
LU | 02.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 02.05.2020 | ||
LU | 02.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 02.05.2020 | ||
LU | 02.05.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
LU | 02.05.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
NO | 04.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5509905 (MICHEL PETER [CH]); | [XI]US2005182360 (YEANDEL JULIAN [CH], et al); | [X]WO2010052275 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) |