Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10889273 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2021 | B2 | US2018265055 | 20.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017048868 | 14.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6692313B | Global Dossier | 13.05.2020 | B2 | JP2018149981 | 27.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017048868 | 14.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3385135 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2023 | B1 | EP3385135 | 10.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017048868 | 14.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2965439T | 15.04.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2017048868 | 14.03.2017 |