EP3379401 - TOUCH TYPE DISTINGUISHING METHOD AND TOUCH INPUT DEVICE PERFORMING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hideep Inc. 3F Dasan Tower Sampyeong-dong 49 Daewangpangyo-ro 644beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13493 / KR | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Seyeob (Dasan Tower, Sampyeong-dong) 3F, 49 Daewangpangyo-ro 644beon-gil 13493 Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | KASTEL Patentanwälte PartG mbB St.-Cajetan-Straße 41 81669 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/39] | Kastel, Stefan Kastel Patentanwälte St.-Cajetan-Straße 41 81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18162565.8 | 19.03.2018 | [2018/39] | Priority number, date | KR20170034501 | 20.03.2017 Original published format: KR 20170034501 | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3379401 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/041 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
G06F3/0416 (EP,US);
G06F3/04166 (KR);
G06F3/0412 (CN);
G06F21/316 (US);
G06F21/32 (KR,US);
G06F21/44 (CN);
G06F3/0414 (CN,KR);
G06F3/0418 (CN);
G06F3/044 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] |
Former [2018/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSARTUNTERSCHEIDUNGSVERFAHREN UND BERÜHRUNGSEINGABEVORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DAVON | [2018/39] | English: | TOUCH TYPE DISTINGUISHING METHOD AND TOUCH INPUT DEVICE PERFORMING THE SAME | [2018/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DISTINCTION DE TYPE TACTILE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENTRÉE TACTILE METTANT EN UVRE CE PROCÉDÉ | [2018/39] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 19.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3054381 (HIDEEP INC [KR]) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 65] , [0 69] , [0 75] , [0 86] , [0 87] , [0 88] , [0 90] , [0 92] , [0 95] - [0098]; figures 1, 5, 6, 7 * [I] 2-8,10-15; | [A]WO2016195934 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0003] , [0 30] , [0 39] - [0050] - [0 54] - [0057]; figures 3, 5, 9 *; | [A]EP3133473 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0087] - [0090] - [0 98] - [0109] - [ 131] , [ 133]; figures 4-9 * |